Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 13-921
No. 13-921
Title:
Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-9526, 12-9527)
  Decision Date:July 19, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:October 31, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 29 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2014)
Feb 26 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 4, 2014.
Mar 5 2014 Brief amici curiae of Basin Electric Power Cooperative, et al. filed.
Mar 5 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Iron and Steel Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Mar 5 2014 Brief amici curiae of Arizona, Nebraska, and Thirteen Other States and State Agencies. filed.
Mar 28 2014 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 16, 2014, for all respondents.
Apr 16 2014 Brief of respondent Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Apr 16 2014 Brief of respondent Sierra Club in opposition filed.
May 5 2014 Reply of petitioners Oklahoma, et al. filed. (Distributed)
May 6 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 22, 2014.
May 27 2014 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Patrick R. Wyrick Office of the Attorney General(405) 521-3921
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK  73105
patrick.wyrick@oag.ok.gov
Party name: Oklahoma, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Andrea Susanne Issod Sierra Club415-977-5544
    Counsel of Record85 Second Street, 2nd Floor
San Francisco, CA  94105
andrea.issod@sierraclub.org
Party name: Sierra Club
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Other:
Thomas Charles Horne Attorney General(602) 542-8535
State of Arizona
1275 W. Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ  85007
tom.horne@azag.gov
Party name: Arizona, Nebraska, and Thirteen Other States and State Agencies.
 
Allen Anthony Kacenjar Squire Sanders (US) LLP(216) 479-8500
4900 Key Tower 127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH  44114-1304
allen.kacenjar@squiresanders.com
Party name: American Iron and Steel Institute, et al.
 
Claire Mathew Olson Basin Electric Power Cooperative(701) 223-0441
1717 East Interstate Avenue
Bismarck, ND  58503
colson@bepc.com
Party name: Basin Electric Power Cooperative, et al.
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2