Docket for 13-901
No. 13-901 | |
Title: |
Los Angeles County Flood Control District, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 28, 2014 |
Linked with 13A530 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-56017) |
Decision Date: | August 8, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 26, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 21 2013 |
Application (13A530) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2013 to January 24, 2014, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 5 2013 |
Application (13A530) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 24, 2014. |
Jan 24 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2014) |
Feb 19 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 31, 2014. |
Feb 26 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed. |
Feb 26 2014 |
Brief amicus curiae of The International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. |
Feb 27 2014 |
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Flood and Stormwater Management Agencies filed. |
Feb 27 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Florida Stormwater Association and Southeast Stormwater Association filed. |
Mar 31 2014 |
Brief of respondents Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 15 2014 |
Reply of petitioners Los Angeles County Flood Control District, et al. filed. |
Apr 16 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 2, 2014. |
May 5 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | | |
Timothy T. Coates |
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP | (310) 859-7811 |
Counsel of Record | 5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90036 | |
| tcoates@gmsr.com |
Party name: Los Angeles County Flood Control District, et al. |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Aaron Colangelo |
Natural Resources Defense Council | (202)-289-2376 |
Counsel of Record | 1152 15th Street, NW, Suite 300 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
| acolangelo@nrdc.org |
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. |
Other: | | |
Jessica Erin DeMonte |
Squire Sanders (US) LLP | (312) 781-1123 |
| Three First National PLaza | |
| 70 W.Madison Street, Suite2015 | |
| Chicago, IL 60602-4390 | |
| jessica.demonte@squiresanders.com |
Party name: National Association of Flood and Stormwater Management Agencies |
| | |
Mohammad O. Jazil |
Hopping Green & Sams, P.A. | (850)-222-7500 |
| 119 South Monroe Street, Suite 300 | |
| Tallahassee, FL 32301 | |
| mohammadj@hgslaw.com |
Party name: Florida Stormwater Association and Southeast Stormwater Association |
| | |
Melissa A. Thorme |
Downey Brand LLP | (916) 444-1000 |
| 621 Capitol Mall, 18th Floor | |
| Sacramento, CA 95814 | |
| mthorme@downeybrand.com |
Party name: National League of Cities, et al. |
| | |
Roderick E. Walston |
Best Best & Krieger LLP | (619) 525-1300 |
| 655 West Broadway, Suite 1500 | |
| San Diego, CA 92101 | |
| roderick.walston@bbklaw.com |
Party name: The International Municipal Lawyers Association |