Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-565
No. 13-565
Title:
Metso Minerals, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Powerscreen International Distribution, Limited, nka Terex GB Limited, et al.
Docketed:November 7, 2013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2011-1572, 2012-1168, 2012-1169)
  Decision Date:May 14, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:August 9, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 5 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2013)
Dec 9 2013 Brief of respondents Powerscreen International Distribution, Limited, nka Terex GB Limited, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 23 2013 Reply of petitioner Metso Minerals, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 24 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014.
Jan 13 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Martin B. Pavane Cozen O'Connor(212) 883-4900
277 Park Avenue
New York, NY  10172
Party name: Metso Minerals, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jon R. Trembath Lathrop Gage LLP(720) 931-3243
    Counsel of Record950 Seventeenth Street
Suite 2400
Denver, CO  80202
jtrembath@lathropgage.com
Party name: Powerscreen International Distribution, Limited, nka Terex GB Limited, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543