Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-484
No. 13-484
Title:
Carl Eric Olsen, Petitioner
v.
Drug Enforcement Administration
Docketed:October 17, 2013
Linked with 13A36
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-1265)
  Decision Date:January 22, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:April 15, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 2 2013 Application (13A36) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2013 to September 12, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 8 2013 Application (13A36) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 12, 2013.
Sep 9 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2013)
Oct 24 2013 Waiver of right of respondent Drug Enforcement Administration to respond filed.
Oct 30 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 15, 2013.
Nov 18 2013 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Carl E. Olsen 130 E. Aurora Ave.
Des Moines, IA  50313-3654
Party name: Carl Eric Olsen
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Drug Enforcement Administration

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543