Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-288
No. 13-288
Title:
MHC Financing Limited Partnership, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of San Rafael, California, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(07-15982, 09-16447, 09-16451, 09-16612, 09-16613)
  Decision Date:April 17, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 3 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2013)
Sep 10 2013 Waiver of right of respondent Contempo Marin Home Owners Association to respond filed.
Sep 10 2013 Waiver of right of respondent City of San Rafael, California to respond filed.
Sep 17 2013 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioners MHC Financing Limited Partnership and Grapeland Vistas, Inc.
Sep 18 2013 Letter of September 18, 2013, from counsel for petitioners received.
Sep 18 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 11, 2013.
Sep 20 2013 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondent Contempo Marin Home Owners Association.
Sep 26 2013 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed. (Distributed)
Oct 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Oct 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association filed. (Distributed)
Oct 4 2013 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Oct 7 2013 Response Requested . (Due November 6, 2013)
Oct 18 2013 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2013, for all respondents.
Nov 6 2013 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Dec 3 2013 Brief of respondent City of San Rafael, California in opposition filed.
Dec 6 2013 Brief of respondent Contempo Marin Home Owners Association in opposition filed.
Dec 20 2013 Reply of petitioners MHC Financing Limited Partnership, et al. filed.
Dec 24 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014.
Jan 13 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: MHC Financing Limited Partnership, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Lori R Mason Five Palo Alto Square 3000 El Camino(650) 843-5000
    Counsel of RecordPalo Alto, CA  94306-2155
lmason@cooley.com
Party name: Contempo Marin Home Owners Association
 
Michael J. von Loewenfeldt Kerr & Wagstaff LLP(415)-371-8500
    Counsel of Record100 Spear Street, Suite 1800
San Francisco, CA  94105
Party name: City of San Rafael, California
Other:
Elliot L. Bien Bien & Summers LLP(415) 472-1500
829 Las Pavadas Avenue
San Rafael, CA  94903
elb@biencounsel.com
Party name: Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association
 
R. S. Radford Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
rsr@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Jeremy B. Rosen Horvitz & Levy LLP(818) 995-0800
15760 Ventura Boulevard
18th Floor
Encino, CA  91436
jrosen@horvitzlevy.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
 
Thomas J. Ward National Association of Home Builders(202) 266-8230
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
tward@nahb.org
Party name: National Association of Home Builders

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543