Docket for 13-240
No. 13-240 | |
Title: |
Carrie Schlaud, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 21, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-1105) |
Decision Date: | May 22, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 19 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2013) |
Sep 6 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 21, 2013. |
Oct 21 2013 |
Brief of respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 31 2013 |
Reply of petitioners Carrie Schlaud, et al. filed. |
Nov 4 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 26, 2013. |
Jun 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 30, 2014. |
Jul 1 2014 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED For further consideration in light of Harris v. Quinn, 573 U. S. ___ (2014). |
Aug 4 2014 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|