Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-1505
No. 13-1505
Title:
Marshall Freidus, et al., Petitioners
v.
ING Groep N.V., et al.
Docketed:June 18, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-4514-cv)
  Decision Date:November 22, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:March 18, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 16 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2014)
Jul 11 2014 Waiver of right of respondents ING Groep N.V., et al. to respond filed.
Jul 14 2014 Waiver of right of respondents ING Groep N.V., et al. to respond filed.
Jul 23 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Aug 12 2014 Response Requested . (Due September 11, 2014)
Sep 11 2014 Brief of respondents ING Groep N.V., et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 25 2014 Reply of petitioners Marshall Freidus, et al. filed.
Oct 1 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014.
Mar 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015.
Mar 25 2015 Supplemental brief of respondents ING Groep N.V., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 26 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioners Marshall Freidus, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 30 2015 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Omnicare, Inc. v. Laborers Dist. Council Constr. Industry Pension Fund, 575 U. S. ___ (2015).
May 1 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Steven F. Hubachek Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP(619) 231-1058
    Counsel of Record655 West Broadway, Suite 1900
San Diego, CA  92101
shubachek@rgrdlaw.com
Party name: Marshall Freidus, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Adam S. Hakki 599 Lexington Ave.(212) 848-4924
    Counsel of RecordNew York, NY  10022
ahakki@shearman.com
Party name: ING Groep N.V., et al.
 
Mitchell A. Lowenthal Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP(212) 225-2000
    Counsel of RecordOne Liberty Plaza
New York, NY  10006
mlowenthal@cgsh.com
Party name: ING Groep N.V., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543