Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 13-1339
No. 13-1339
Title:
Spokeo, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Thomas Robins
Docketed:May 7, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-56843)
  Decision Date:February 4, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 1 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2014)
May 7 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 7, 2014.
Jun 2 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Jun 4 2014 Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed.
Jun 5 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Trans Union LLC filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amici curiae of eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., Google Inc., and Yahoo! Inc. filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Professional Background Screeners, et al. filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Jun 6 2014 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Jun 9 2014 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 6, 2014.
Aug 6 2014 Brief of respondent Thomas Robins in opposition filed.
Aug 19 2014 Reply of petitioner Spokeo, Inc. filed.
Aug 20 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Oct 6 2014 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Mar 13 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Apr 1 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015.
Apr 1 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioner Spokeo, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 20 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2015.
Apr 27 2015 Petition GRANTED.
Jun 5 2015 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 2, 2015.
Jun 5 2015 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2015.
Jul 2 2015 Brief of petitioner Spokeo, Inc. filed.
Jul 2 2015 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Jul 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Trans Union LLC filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Sensible Public Records Access, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of eBay Inc., et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Professional Background Screeners, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Time, Inc., and Seven Media Organizations filed.
Jul 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Aug 3 2015 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including August 31, 2015.
Aug 31 2015 Brief of respondent Thomas Robins filed.
Sep 3 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Public Knowledge filed.
Sep 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. filed.
Sep 3 2015 Brief amici curiae of Public Law Professors filed.
Sep 4 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Pension Rights Center filed.
Sep 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of Information Privacy Law Scholars filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Sep 8 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Public Justice, P.C., et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Digital Democracy filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Restitution and Remedies Scholars filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Inc., et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Sep 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Sep 9 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 2, 2015
Sep 10 2015 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 11 2015 The record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 21 2015 CIRCULATED
Sep 30 2015 Reply of petitioner Spokeo, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 5 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 2 2015 Argued. For petitioner: Andrew J. Pincus, Washington, D. C. For respondent: William S. Consovoy, Arlington, Va.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
May 16 2016 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Breyer, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor, J., joined.
Jun 17 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Spokeo, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
William S. Consovoy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(703) 243-9423
    Counsel of Record3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
will@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Thomas Robins
 
Deepak Gupta Gupta Wessler PLLC(202) 888-1741
1735 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
deepak@guptawessler.com
Party name: Thomas Robins
 
Roger J. Perlstadt 350 North LaSalle Street, Suite 1300 3125896370
Chicago, IL  60654
rperlstadt@edelson.com
Party name: Thomas Robins
Other:
Cory L. Andrews Washington Legal Foundation(202)-588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
candrews@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
 
Andrew L. Brasher Solicitor General(334) 242-7300
Office of Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
abrasher@ago.state.al.us
Party name: Alabama, et al.
 
Sara Cable Office of the Attorney General(617) 727-2200
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA  02108
sara.cable@state.ma.us
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
 
Angela J. Campbell Institute for Public Representation(202) 662-9535
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., NW, Ste. 312
Washington, DC  20001-0000
campbeaj@law.georgetown.edu
Party name: Center for Digital Democracy
 
Patrick J. Carome Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
patrick.carome@wilmerhale.com
Party name: eBay Inc., et al.
 
Stephen M. Dane Relman, Dane & Colfax PLLC(202) 728-1888
1225 19th Street, N. W.
Suite 600
Washington, DC  20036
sdane@relmanlaw.com
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
 
Charles Duan Public Knowledge(202) 861-0020
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20036
cduan@publicknowledge.org
Party name: Public Knowledge
 
Kathryn Lee Einspanier Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC  20009
keinspanier@citizen.org
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc., et al.
 
Roy T. Englert Jr. Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck,(202) 775-4500
Untereiner & Sauber LLP
1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411
Suite 411L
Washington, DC  20006
renglert@robbinsrussell.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Meir Feder Jones Day(212) 326-3755
222 East 41st Street
New York, NY  10017
mfeder@jonesday.com
Party name: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
 
Anne P. Fortney Hudson Cook LLP(202) 223-6930
1020 19th Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC  20036
afortney@hudco.com
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association
 
Laura R. Handman Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP(202) 973-4200
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Ste. 800
Washington, DC  20006-3402
laurahandman@dwt.com
Party name: Time, Inc., and Seven Media Organizations
 
Karen L. Handorf Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC(202) 408-4600
1100 New York Avenue NW, Suite 500 East
Washington, DC  20005
khandorf@cohenmilstein.com
Party name: Pension Rights Center
 
F. Andrew Hessick 383 South University Street(801) 587-7862
Salt Lake City, UT  84112
andy.hessick@law.utah.edu
Party name: Public Law Professors
 
Marcia C. Hofmann 25 Tayor Street (415) 830-6660
San Francisco, CA  94102
marcia@marciahofmann.com
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology, et al.
 
Joseph W. Jacquot Foley & Lardner LLP(904) 359-8769
One Independence Drive
Suite 1300
Jacksonville, FL  32202
jjacquot@foley.com
Party name: Coalition for Sensible Public Records Access, et al.
 
Michael T. Kirkpatrick Georgetown University Law Center202-662-9535
600 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC  20001
michael.kirkpatrick@law.georgetown.edu
Party name: Information Privacy Law Scholars
 
Deborah J. La Fetra Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Douglas Laycock University of Virginia School of Law(434) 243-8546
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA  22903
dlaycock@virginia.edu
Party name: Restitution and Remedies Scholars
 
Robert A. Long Jr. Covington & Burling LLP(202) 662-6000
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC  20001-4956
rlong@cov.com
Party name: American Bankers Association, et al.
 
Mary Massaron Plunkett Cooney(248) 901-4000
38505 Woodward Avenue
Suite 2000
Bloomfield, MI  48304
mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
Brian Ross Melendez Dykema Gossett, PLLC612 486-1589
4000 Wells Fargo Center
90 South Seventh Street
Minneapolis, MN  55402-3903
bmelendez@dykema.com
Party name: ACA International
 
Christopher A. Mohr Meyer Klipper & Mohr PLLC(202) 637-0850
923 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
chrismohr@mkmdc.com
Party name: National Association of Professional Background Screeners, et al.
 
Stephen J. Newman Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP(310) 556-5800
2029 Century Park East
Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA  90067
lacalendar@stroock.com
Party name: Trans Union LLC
 
Leah M. Nicholls Public Justice, P.C.(202) 797-8600
1825 K Street NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC  20006
lnicholls@publicjustice.net
Party name: Public Justice, P.C., et al.
 
Benjamin G. Robbins New England Legal Foundation(617) 695-3660
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA  02111-2504
benrobbins@nelfonline.org
Party name: New England Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Marc Rotenberg Electronic Privacy Information Center(202) 483-1140
1718 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC  20009
rotenberg@epic.org
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
 
Malcolm L. Stewart Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
malcolm.l.stewart@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Michael E. Wall Senior Attorney(415) 875-6100
Natural Resoures Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 20th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94104
mwall@nrdc.org
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council, et al.
 
Thomas J. Ward National Association of Home Builders(202) 266-8230
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
tward@nahb.org
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
 
J. Michael Weston Lederer Weston Craig PLLC(319) 365-1184
118 Third Avenue SE
Suite 700
Cedar Rapids, IA  52406
mweston@lwclawyers.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
Jeffrey R. White Center for Constitutional Litigation PC(202) 944-2803
777 6th Street, N.W., Suite 250
Washington, DC  20001
jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com
Party name: American Association for Justice
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
Evan A. Young Baker Botts LLP(512) 322-2500
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX  78701-4078
evan.young@bakerbotts.com
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
December 09, 2016 | Version 2014.2