Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-1180
No. 13-1180
Title:
Philip Morris USA, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Leon Barbanell, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley Barbanell, Deceased
Docketed:March 31, 2014
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
  Case Nos.:(4D09-3987)
  Decision Date:October 17, 2012
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:February 13, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 28 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2014)
Apr 1 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Leon Barbanell, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley Barbanell, Deceased to respond filed.
Apr 2 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2014.
Apr 4 2014 Response Requested . (Due May 5, 2014)
May 2 2014 Brief of respondent Leon Barbanell, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley Barbanell, Deceased in opposition filed.
May 19 2014 Reply of petitioner Philip Morris USA, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
May 20 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 5, 2014.
Jun 9 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Miguel A. Estrada Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
mestrada@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Bard D. Rockenbach Burlington & Rockenbach(561) 721-0400
    Counsel of Record444 West Railroad Ave., Suite 430
West Palm Beach, FL  33401
bdr@FLAppellateLaw.com
Party name: Leon Barbanell, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley Barbanell, Deceased

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543