~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 22 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 29, 2013) |
Apr 3 2013 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. |
Apr 23 2013 |
Second supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. (Distributed) |
May 13 2013 |
Third supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. (Distributed) |
May 15 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2013. |
May 15 2013 |
Fourth supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. (Distributed) |
May 17 2013 |
Fifth supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. (Distributed) |
May 20 2013 |
Sixth supplemental brief of petitioner Sukit Kumvachirapitag filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 3 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jun 10 2013 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Jun 27 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED. |
Jul 22 2013 |
Rehearing DENIED. |