Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 12-8321
No. 12-8321
Christopher Eric Bouchat, Petitioner
Docketed:January 22, 2013
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
  Case Nos.:(Misc. No. 2, September Term, 2012)
  Decision Date:November 9, 2012

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 9 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2013)
Jan 23 2013 Waiver of right of respondent Maryland to respond filed.
Feb 7 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 22, 2013.
Feb 25 2013 The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until March 18, 2013, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Mar 18 2013 Petitioner complied with order of February 25, 2013.
Mar 21 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2013.
Apr 15 2013 Petition DENIED.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Christopher E. Bouchat 5627 Woodbine Road(443) 538-8584
Woodbine, MD  21797
Party name: Christopher Eric Bouchat
Attorneys for Respondent:
William F. Brockman Deputy Solicitor General(410) 576-7055
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD  21202
Party name: Maryland


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543