Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 10-6323
No. 10-6323
Title:
Christopher Irby, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 9, 2010
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
  Case Nos.:(PD-1097-08)
  Decision Date:June 16, 2010

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 2 2010 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 12, 2010)
Oct 1 2010 Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Oct 14 2010 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 29, 2010.
Oct 20 2010 Response Requested . (Due November 19, 2010)
Nov 17 2010 Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Dec 2 2010 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2011.
Jan 10 2011 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Katherine A. Drew Chief, Appellate Division(214) 875-2360
Dallas County Public Defender's Office
Frank Crowley Courts Building
133 N. Riverfront Boulevard, LB-2
Dallas, TX  75207-4399
kathi.drew@dallascounty.org
Party name: Christopher Irby
Attorneys for Respondent:
Michael R. Casillas Assistant District Attorney(214) 653-3600
    Counsel of Record Dallas County DA's Office
133 N. Riverfront Boulevard, LB 19
Dallas, TX  75207-4399
mcasillas@dallascounty.org
Party name: Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543