Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 06-8513
No. 06-8513     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Johnny Avila, Jr., Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:December 27, 2006
Linked with 06A410
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
  Case Nos.:(S045982)
  Decision Date:May 15, 2006
  Rehearing Denied:August 2, 2006

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 20 2006 Application (06A410) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 31, 2006 to December 30, 2006, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Oct 26 2006 Application (06A410) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 29, 2006.
Dec 21 2006 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 26, 2007)
Feb 2 2007 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 26, 2007.
Feb 21 2007 Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Mar 8 2007 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 23, 2007.
Mar 26 2007 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Mark E. Cutler P.O. Box 172 (530) 885-7718
Cool, CA  95614-0172
cutler@mac.com
Party name: Johnny Avila, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Louis M. Vasquez Office of the Attorney General(559) 477-1668
2550 Mariposa Mall, Rm. 5090
Fresno, CA  93721
Party name: California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543