Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 06-410
No. 06-410
Title:
Deborah R. Bauer, et al., Petitioners
v.
Advance PCS, et al.
Docketed:September 21, 2006
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
  Case Nos.:(S05G2011)
  Decision Date:June 26, 2006

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 19 2006 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2006)
Oct 23 2006 Brief of respondents Advance PCS, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 7 2006 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 21, 2006.
Nov 27 2006 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Arthur S. Gold Gold & Coulson(312) 372-0777
11 S. LaSalle Street, Suite 2500
Chicago, IL  60603
Party name: Deborah R. Bauer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Paul J. Ondrasik Jr. Steptoe & Johnson, LLP(202) 429-8088
1330 Connecticut Avenue, Northwest
Washington, DC  20036-1795
Party name: Advance PCS, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543