Docket for 06-324
No. 06-324 | |
Title: |
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Petitioner |
v. |
Michael A. Genord, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 8, 2006 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (04-2486) |
Decision Date: | March 14, 2006 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 9, 2006 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 6 2006 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2006) |
Oct 6 2006 |
Brief of respondents Michael A. Genord, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 20 2006 |
Reply of petitioner Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 25 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 9, 2006. |
Nov 13 2006 |
Petition DENIED. |
|