Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 04-6438
No. 04-6438
Title:
Robert Kennedy, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 22, 2004
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(02-4917)
  Decision Date:June 24, 2004

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 22 2004 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2004)
Oct 14 2004 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 22, 2004.
Nov 19 2004 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 22, 2004.
Dec 21 2004 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jan 6 2005 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 21, 2005.
Jan 24 2005 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Randy V. Cargill Magee, Foster, Goldstein & Sayers, P.C.(540) 343-9800
    Counsel of RecordPO Box 404
Roanoke, VA  24003-0404
Party name: Robert Kennedy, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paul D. Clement Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543