Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 03-1313
No. 03-1313
Title:
Sylvia Davis, as Guardian and Next Friend for Donnell E. Davis, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:March 17, 2004
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(02-6198)
  Decision Date:September 10, 2003
  Rehearing Denied:December 16, 2003

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 15 2004 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2004)
Apr 7 2004 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 17, 2004.
May 17 2004 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2004.
May 24 2004 Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
May 24 2004 Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Constitutional Rights filed.
Jun 8 2004 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2004.
Jun 28 2004 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Franklin B. Velie Sullivan & Worchester, L.L.P.(212) 660-3037
    Counsel of Record1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10104
Party name: Sylvia Davis, as Guardian and Next Friend for Donnell E. Davis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Theodore B. Olson Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States, et al.
Other:
Barbara J. Olshansky Center for Constitutional Rights(650) 736-2312
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305
Party name: The Center for Constitutional Rights

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543