Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23A243
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23A243
Title:Vivek H. Murthy, Surgeon General, et al., Applicants
v.
Missouri, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2023
Linked with 23-411
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-30445)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2023Application (23A243) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 14 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22-cv-01213, is hereby administratively stayed until 11:59 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, September 22, 2023. It is further ordered that any response to the application be filed on or before Wednesday, September 20, 2023, by 4 p.m. (EDT).
Sep 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Ohio filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Response to application from respondent Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Michael Benz filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Kennedy Plaintiffs filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Angela Reading filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Notice of Appearance by Interested Party and Notice of Related Case Captioned Richard Jackson v. Twitter, Inc.; Notice of Intent to File Amicus Brief of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (October 13, 2023)
Sep 21 2023Reply of applicant Vivek H. Murthy, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Sep 22 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: Upon further consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants, the response, and the reply filed thereto, it is ordered that the stay issued on September 14, 2023, is hereby extended until 11:59 p.m. (EDT) on Wednesday, September 27, 2023.
Sep 25 2023Supplemental Letter from Missouri, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 26 2023Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application For A Stay filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 26 2023Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application For A Stay filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 26 2023Letter to the Clerk filed by Missouri, et al.
Main Document
Oct 03 2023Supplemental Letter from Missouri, et al. filed.
Main Document
Oct 05 2023Third Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application for a Stay filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 06 2023Amicus brief of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (corrected copy to be submitted by counsel)(October 13, 2023)
Oct 06 2023Notice and Opposition to Stay Request of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (October 13, 2023)
Oct 10 2023Response to Applicants' Third Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Application for a Stay of Injunction filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 13 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicant, the response, and the reply filed thereto, it is ordered that the preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22-cv-01213, is hereby administratively stayed until 5 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, October 20, 2023.
Oct 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Michael Eugene Reznick filed.
Main Document
Oct 20 2023Application (23A243) referred to the Court.
Oct 20 2023Application (23A243) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted. The preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22ā€“cvā€“01213, as modified by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on October 3, 2023, case No. 23ā€“30445, is stayed. The application for stay is also treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted on the questions presented in the application (case No. 23-411). The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from grant of application for stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Vivek H. Murthy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Michael DivineOffice of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

MURRILLE@AG.LOUISIANA.GOV
225-326-6766
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Other
Michael Jason Hendershot
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General's Office
30 E. Broad Street, 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

michael.hendershot@ohioago.gov
614.466.8980
Party name: State of Ohio
Michael E. ReznickLaw Offices of Michael E. Reznick, P.C.
283 Ocho Rios Way
Agoura Hills, CA 91377

reznagoura@aol.com
18184375630
Party name: Michael Eugene Reznick
D. Adam Candeub
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1185 Wrightwind Drive
Okemos, MI 48864

candeub@msu.edu
517 918 7147
Party name: Michael Benz
Mary Holland
    Counsel of Record
Children's Health Defense
853 Franklin Ave.
Suite 511
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417

MARY.HOLLAND@CHILDRENSHEALTHDEFENSE.ORG
(202) 854-1310
Party name: Kennedy Plaintiffs
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Angela Reading
Brennan Tyler BrooksThomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
3367078855
Party name: Angela Reading

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543