Docket for 23A350
|
Oct 13 2023 | Application (23A350) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 19 2023 | Response to application (23A350) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on October 30, 2023. | | | Oct 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Energy Infrastructure Council filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County,TX filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent Public Interest Respondents filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency, et al. filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Nov 01 2023 | Reply of applicant Kinder Morgan, Inc., et al. filed. | | ReplyProof of Service |
|