Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-997
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-997
Title:Karyn D. Stanley, Petitioner
v.
City of Sanford, Florida
Docketed:March 12, 2024
Linked with 23A550
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10002)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2023Application (23A550) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2024 to March 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Application (23A550) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.
Jan 23 2024Application (23A550) to extend further the time from February 8, 2024 to March 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written Request
Jan 30 2024Application (23A550) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 8, 2024.
Mar 08 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2024 to May 13, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2024.
Apr 09 2024Brief amici curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 11 2024Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Fire Fighters filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2024Brief of respondent City of Sanford, Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
May 28 2024Reply of petitioner Karyn D. Stanley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 15 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 9, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

DEEPAK@GUPTAWESSLER.COM
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Karyn D. Stanley
Attorneys for Respondent
Jessica Christy Conner
    Counsel of Record
Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, P.A.
201 E. Pine Street, Suite 1200
Orlando, FL 32801

Jessica.Conner@DRML-Law.com
407-422-4310
Party name: City of Sanford, Florida
Other
Michael L. Foreman
    Counsel of Record
Penn State Law - Civil Rights Appellate Clinic
329 Innovation Blvd., Suite 118
University Park, PA 16802

MLF25@PSU.EDU
814-865-3832
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association, et al.
John R. Mooney
    Counsel of Record
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, PC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jmooney@mooneygreen.com
2027830010
Party name: International Association of Fire Fighters

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543