Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-995
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-995
Title:Nadine Gazzola, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kathleen Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.
Docketed:March 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3068)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2024 to May 13, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2024Response to motion from petitioner filed.
Main Document
Apr 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2024.
May 13 2024Brief of respondents Kathleen Hochul, Governor of New York, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2024Reply of petitioners Nadine Gazzola, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paloma Appolonia Capanna
    Counsel of Record
Paloma A. Capanna
106-B Professional Drive
Beaufort, NC 28516

pcapanna@yahoo.com
3155842929
Party name: Nadine Gazzola, Individually, and as Co-Owner, President and as Batfe Federal Fire-Arms Licensee Responsible Person for Zero Tolerance Manufacturing Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: Kathleen Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543