Docket for 23-969
|
Mar 04 2024 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 5, 2024) | | Jurisdictional StatementAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 22 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2024 to May 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2024. | | | Apr 05 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 06 2024 | Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees The Mandan, Hidatsa and Arikara Nation, Lisa DeVille, and Cesar Alvarez, Jr. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 06 2024 | Memorandum of appellees Doug Burgum, Governor of North Dakota, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service |
|