Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-927
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-927
Title:National Religious Broadcasters Noncommercial Music License Committee, Petitioner
v.
Copyright Royalty Board, et al.
Docketed:February 27, 2024
Linked with 23A546
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1243, 21-1244, 21-1245)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2023Application (23A546) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2023 to January 25, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 15 2023Application (23A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2024.
Jan 05 2024Application (23A546) to extend further the time from January 25, 2024 to February 23, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Jan 09 2024Application (23A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.
Feb 23 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2024)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2024Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2024Waiver of right of respondent SoundExchange, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Young America's Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Gateway Creative Broadcasting, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Radio Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 11 2024Response Requested. (Due May 13, 2024)
May 03 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2024 to May 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2024.
May 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Media Research Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2024Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2024Brief of respondent SoundExchange, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 04 2024Reply of petitioner National Religious Broadcasters Noncommercial Music License Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters Noncommercial Music License Committee
Rory Thomas GrayAlliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Rd. NE, Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

RGRAY@ADFLEGAL.ORG
770-339-0774
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters Noncommercial Music License Committee
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: SoundExchange, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

SGAYLORD@ELON.EDU
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Brooks E. Harlow
    Counsel of Record
Technology & Communications Law, PLLC
12703 Fox Woods Drive
Herndon, VA 20171

bharlow@techcomm.law
2066508206
Party name: Young America's Foundation
Steven T. McFarland
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Lane
Suite 302
Springfield , VA 22151

smcfarland@clsnet.org
7036421070
Party name: Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals
Laura Darien NammoCenter for Law & Religious Freedom
8001 Braddock Rd. Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

laura@clsnet.org
7038621819
Party name: Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals
Brian Himanshu Pandya
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
901 New York Ave NW
Suite 700-East
Washington, DC 20001

BHPandya@duanemorris.com
(202) 776-7807
Party name: Catholic Radio Association
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Stone | Hilton PLLC
P.O. Box 150112
Austin, TX 78715

judd@stonehilton.com
(737) 465-7248
Party name: Media Research Center
Jeffrey Albert Wald
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
380 Knollwood Street
Winston-Salem, NC 27106

jeffrey.wald@nelsonmullins.com
336-774-3335
Party name: Gateway Creative Broadcasting, Family Stations, Inc., and University of Northwestern-St.Paul/Northwestern Media
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543