Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-914
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-914
Title:Diane Zilka, Petitioner
v.
City of Philadelphia, Tax Review Board
Docketed:February 23, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(20 EAP 2022, 21 EAP 2022)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2024 to April 24, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2024.
Mar 25 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

CPHILLIPS@SIDLEY.COM
+1 202 736 8000
Party name: Diane Zilka
Attorneys for Respondent
Craig Randall Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
City of Philadelphia Law Department
1515 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102

craig.gottlieb@phila.gov
6098283411
Party name: Tax Review Board City of Philadelphia
Other
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#700
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Andrew Michael Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Kostelanetz, LLP
601 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 260
Washington, DC 20001

aweiner@kostelanetz.com
2027906999
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543