Docket for 23-9
|
Apr 03 2023 | Application (22A868) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 4, 2023 to July 3, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Apr 06 2023 | Application (22A868) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 2, 2023. | | | Jun 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 25 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2023 to August 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2023. | | | Aug 04 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 23 2023 | Brief of respondents Joshua Atchley, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Sep 06 2023 | Reply of petitioners AstraZeneca UK Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 02 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration of this petition. | | |
|