Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-880
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-880
Vide 23-1010, 23-877, 23-878, 23-879, 23-944
Title:National Association for Gun Rights, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Naperville, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:February 15, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1353)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024, for all respondents.
Mar 15 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Brief of respondents Illinois, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Brief of Cook County Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barry Kevin Arrington
    Counsel of Record
Arrington Law Firm
4195 Wadsworth Boulevard
Wheat Ridge, CO 80033

BARRY@ARRINGTONPC.COM
3032057870
Party name: National Association for Gun Rights, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
115 South LaSalle Street
23rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60603

JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois
Jessica Megan Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County State's Attorney
500 Richard J. Daley Center Place, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

jessica.scheller@cookcountysao.org
3126036934
Party name: Cook County, Toni Preckwinkle, Kimberly M. Foxx, and Thomas J. Dart
Other
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543