Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-877
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-877
Vide 23-1010, 23-878, 23-879, 23-880, 23-944
Title:Dane Harrel, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kwame Raoul, Attorney General of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:February 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1826)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024, for all respondents.
Mar 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Police Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Brief of respondents Illinois, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Brief of Cook County Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2024Reply of petitioners Dane Harrel, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Dane Harrel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
115 South LaSalle Street
23rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60603

JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV
312-814-5376
Party name: Kwame Raoul, et al.
Jessica Megan Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County State's Attorney
500 Richard J. Daley Center Place, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

jessica.scheller@cookcountysao.org
3126036934
Party name: Cook County, Toni Preckwinkle, Kimberly M. Foxx, and Thomas J. Dart
Other
James Laurence Buchal
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & Buchal, LLP
PO Box 86620
Portland, OR 97286

jbuchal@mbllp.com
5032271011
Party name: National Police Association
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543