Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-871
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-871
Title:Lotus Vaping Technologies, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Food and Drug Administration
Docketed:February 13, 2024
Linked with 23A507
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-71328)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2023Application (23A507) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 13, 2023 to February 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Dec 05 2023Application (23A507) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 11, 2024.
Feb 09 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 14, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024.
Mar 11 2024Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 14 2024Brief amici curiae of Vaping Industry Stakeholders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Brief for Food and Drug Administration filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 30 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 06 2024Rescheduled.
May 07 2024Reply of petitioner Lotus Vaping Technologies, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric N. Heyer
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Hine LLP
1919 M Street, N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

ERIC.HEYER@THOMPSONHINE.COM
202-331-8800
Party name: Lotus Vaping Technologies, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Food and Drug Administration
Other
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

JGTATTY@YAHOO.COM
502-412-9179
Party name: Vaping Industry Stakeholders

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543