Docket for 23-863
|
Feb 08 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due March 13, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 06 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2024. | | | Mar 13 2024 | Brief amici curiae of International Law Enforcement Educators & Trainers Assoc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 12 2024 | Brief of respondents Anthony G. Brown, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Maryland, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 25 2024 | Reply of Dominic Bianchi, an individual and resident of Baltimore County, et al. submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
|