SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-799
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-799
Title:
Magellan Technology, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Food and Drug Administration
Docketed:
January 24, 2024
Linked with 23A421
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-2426)
Decision Date:
June 16, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
August 25, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2023
Application (23A421) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2023 to January 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 17 2023
Application (23A421) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 22, 2024.
Jan 22 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 25 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 23, 2024 to March 25, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2024
Feb 23 2024
Brief amici curiae of E-Cigarette Businesses and Trade Associations filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2024
Brief of respondent United States Food and Drug Administration in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 10 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 16 2024
Rescheduled.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric N. Heyer
Counsel of Record
Thompson Hine LLP
1919 M Street, N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036
ERIC.HEYER@THOMPSONHINE.COM
202-263-4128
Party name: Magellan Technology, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Food and Drug Administration
Other
Eric Philip Gotting
Counsel of Record
Keller and Heckman LLP
1001 G Street, NW Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20001
gotting@khlaw.com
(202) 434-4100
Party name: E-Cigarette Businesses and Trade Associations
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##