Docket for 23-776
|
Nov 09 2023 | Application (23A442) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2023 to January 13, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 16 2023 | Application (23A442) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 13, 2024. | | | Jan 12 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 25 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2024. | | | Mar 14 2024 | Brief of respondent Enterprise Services, LLC in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 03 2024 | Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Israelitt filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|