Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-719
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-719
Title:Donald J. Trump, Petitioner
v.
Norma Anderson, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(23SA300)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Senator Steve Daines & National Republican Senatorial Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2024Letter from counsel for respondent Colorado Republican State Central Committee filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Brief in response to the petition for a writ of certiorari of respondent Norma Anderson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Petition GRANTED. The case is set for oral argument on Thursday, February 8, 2024. Petitioner’s brief on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support or in support of neither party, are to be filed on or before Thursday, January 18, 2024. Respondents’ briefs on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support, are to be filed on or before Wednesday, January 31, 2024. The reply brief, if any, is to be filed on or before 5 p.m., Monday, February 5 2024.
Jan 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Indiana, West Virginia, 25 Other States, and the Arizona Legislature filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Republican National Committee and National Republican Congressional Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2024Record requested from the Supreme Court of Colorado.
Jan 09 2024Record received electronically from the Supreme Court of Colorado and available with the Clerk.
Jan 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Seth Barrett Tillman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2024Record requested from the Denver District Court.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED
Jan 11 2024Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2024Motion of Chris Sevier for leave to intervene filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2024Brief amicus curiae of Vivek Ramaswamy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Any motion pertaining to the oral argument in this case shall be filed on or before Monday, January 29, 2024.
Jan 15 2024Brief amicus curiae of David E. Weisberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Record received electronically from the Denver District Court and available with the Clerk.
Jan 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kurt T. Lash filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of William Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Brief amici curiae of Ryan Binkley, Binkley for President 2024, et al. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief of respondent Colorado Republican State Central Committee in support of reversal filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Jan 17 2024Brief amici curiae of 102 Colorado Registered Electors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amicus curiae of Jack Coben in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amicus curiae of The League for Sportsmen, Law Enforcement and Defense filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amicus curiae of Pearl O. Madrial filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amici curiae of Devin Watkins and Charles Watkins filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Brief amici curiae of Children's Rights Legal Scholars and Advocates in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Senator Steve Daines & National Republican Senatorial Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Association of the Bar of the City of New York in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Derek T. Muller in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, Majority Leader Steve Scalise, and 177 Other Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice, et al. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Former United States Attorneys Robert S. Brewer, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Edward B. Foley, et al. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Honorable Peter Meijer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Akhil Reed Amar, et al. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Terpsehore “Tore” Maras, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Condemned USA filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Chuck Gray, Secretary of State of Wyoming filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor James T. Lindgren filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Larry Kidd filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Kansas Republican Party and 32 Other State and Territorial Republican Parties filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors and Legal Scholars in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Term Limits in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Republican National Committee and National Republican Congressional Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of The Secretaries of State of Missouri, et al. in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Gavin M. Wax, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Motion to extend the time to file joint appendix granted and the time is extended to and including Tuesday, January 23, 2024.
Jan 20 2024Joint Appendix not accepted for filing. (January 24, 2024-complete filing resubmitted electronically.)
Jan 20 2024Joint appendix filed (4 volumes). (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of G. Antaeus B. Edelsohn filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief of respondents Norma Anderson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors Orville Vernon Burton, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by respondent Jena Griswold, Colorado Secretary of State.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of Brian J. Martin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of J. Michael Luttig, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of American Historians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Motion of Professor Seth Barrett Tillman for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Floyd Abrams, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Republican Governors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kermit Roosevelt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors Carol Anderson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Response of Norma Anderson, et al. to motion submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Motion of Chris Sevier for leave to intervene DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 31 2024Amicus brief of David B. Tatge not accepted for filing. (January 31, 2024--correct files to be resubmitted electronically.)
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of David B. Tatge filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief of respondent Jena Griswold, Colorado Secretary of State filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ilya Somin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Former Colorado Secretary of State Mary Estill Buchanan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Retired State Supreme Court Justices filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of David P. Cullenberg, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Republican Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Experts in Democracy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Sherrilyn Ifill filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of San Francisco Taxpayers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Capitol Police Officers Present at the U.S. Capitol on January 6, 2021 filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Professor David M. Driesen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Jordan L. Michelson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Edward J. Larson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy Bates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Josh Autry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Michael T. Worley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Law Professor Mark A. Graber filed. (Feb. 7, 2024) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by United States Justice Foundation and Policy Issues Institute, Inc. (Feb. 7, 2024) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Response of Norma Anderson, et al. to motion submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Amicus brief of United States Justice Foundation & Policy Issues Institute, Inc. submitted.
Feb 02 2024Motion of Professor Seth Barrett Tillman for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument DENIED.
Feb 02 2024Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument filed by respondent GRANTED IN PART, a total of 80 minutes is allotted, and the time is divided as follows: 40 minutes for petitioner, 30 minutes for respondents Anderson, et al., and 10 minutes for respondent Griswold.
Feb 02 2024Motion of David Boyle for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument not accepted for filing. (February 06, 2024)
Feb 05 2024Reply of respondent Colorado Republican State Central Committee in support of reversal filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Motion of Terpsehore “Tore” Maras and Eligible Voters of All 50 States and 1 Territory for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument not accepted for filing. (February 07, 2024)
Feb 08 2024Argued. For petitioner: Jonathan F. Mitchell, Austin, Tex. For respondents Anderson, et al.: Jason C. Murray, Denver, Colo. For respondent Griswold: Shannon W. Stevenson, Solicitor General, Denver, Colo.
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by United States Justice Foundation and Policy Issues Institute, Inc. DENIED.
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to intervene filed by Chris Sevier DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Donald J. Trump
David Alan WarringtonDhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue
Suite 608
Alexandria, VA 22314

dwarrington@dhillonlaw.com
7035741206
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Attorneys for Respondents
Jason Clifford Murray
    Counsel of Record
Olson Grimsley Kawanabe Hinchcliff & Murray LLC
700 17th St.
Suite 1600
Denver, CO 80202

jmurray@olsongrimsley.com
303 535 9157
Party name: Norma Anderson, et al.
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: Colorado Republican State Central Committee in support of reversal
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

shannon.stevenson@coag.gov
720-703-0999
Party name: Colorado Secretary of State Jena Griswold
Other
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
107 S. West Street
Suite 700
Alexandria, VA 22314

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
703-745-5870
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation and Hans von Spakovsky
Vikram David Amar
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
400 Mrak Hall Drive
Davis, CA 95616

vdamar@ucdavis.edu
(925) 858-8855
Party name: Akhil Reed Amar and Vikram David Amar
Joshua Michael Autry
    Counsel of Record
333 W. Vine St
Suite 1200
Lexington, KY 40507

jautry@forthepeople.com
8598998785
Party name: Josh Autry
James Allen Barta
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 W. Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

james.barta@atg.in.gov
317-232-0709
Party name: States of Indiana, West Virginia, 25 Other States, and the Arizona Legislature
Jeremy Charles Bates
    Counsel of Record
21 West Street Apt. 21J
New York, NY 10006

jeremybates3@gmail.com
917-626-2473
Party name: Jeremy Bates
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernsteinlaw@gmail.com
3017752064
Party name: J. Michael Luttig, Peter Keisler, Larry Thompson, Stuart Gerson, Donald Ayer, et. al.
Joshua Michael Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Josh Blackman LLC
1303 San Jacinto Street
Houston, TX 77002

josh@joshblackman.com
2022949003
Party name: Professor Seth Barrett Tillman
Lauren Margaret Blas
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

lblas@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Capitol Police Officers Present at the U.S. Capitol on January 6, 2021
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Nelson Boyle
    Counsel of Record
The Paul Wilkinson Law Firm LLC
999 Jasmine Street
Denver, CO 80220

Nelson@5280Appeals.com
3033337285
Party name: Constitutional Law Professor Mark A. Graber
Michael Adam Caplan
    Counsel of Record
Caplan Cobb LLP
75 Fourteenth Street, NE
Suite 2750
Atlanta, GA 30309

mcaplan@caplancobb.com
404-596-5610
Party name: Former Colorado Secretary of State Mary Estill Buchanan
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Professor Edward J. Larson
Larry E. Coben
    Counsel of Record
Anapol Weiss
8700 E. Vista Bonita Drive
Suite 268
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

lcoben@anapolweiss.com
480-515-4745
Party name: Jack Coben
Gregory L. Diskant
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Common Cause
David M. Driesen
    Counsel of Record
Syracuse Univ. Coll. of Law
Dineen Hall
950 Irving Avenue
Syracuse, NY 13244-1030

ddriesen@syr.edu
3154434218
Party name: Professor David M. Driesen, et al.
Joan Deborah Bolinsky Edelsohn
    Counsel of Record
460 Center Street
Unit 6045
Moraga, CA 94570

SAGEPropertiesLLC09@gmail.com
(415) 944-9509
Party name: G. Antaeus B. Edelsohn
Ronald Andrew Fein
    Counsel of Record
Free Speech For People
1320 Centre St #405
Newton, MA 02459

rfein@freespeechforpeople.org
6172440234
Party name: Retired State Supreme Court Justices
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ashbrook Byrne Kresge LLC
PO Box 8248
Cincinnati, OH 45249

bflowers@ashbrookbk.com
(513) 201-5775
Party name: Professor James T. Lindgren
Faith Elizabeth Gay
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
17th Floor
New York, NY 10104

fgay@selendygay.com
2123909001
Party name: Former Republican Members of Congress
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

JMGORE@JONESDAY.COM
2028793939
Party name: Senator Steve Daines & National Republican Senatorial Committee
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive, Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
5164666690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc.
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

HEATHER@HACKERSTEPHENS.COM
512-399-3022
Party name: Derek T. Muller
Steven A. Hirsch
    Counsel of Record
Keker Van Nest & Peters
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

shirsch@keker.com
4153915400
Party name: Floyd Abrams, Bruce Ackerman, Maryam Ahranjani, Lee C. Bollinger, Erwin Chemerinsky, Alan Chen, Kent Greenfield, Martha Minow, and Geoffrey R. Stone
Anna Estelle Cayton Holland Edwards
    Counsel of Record
Holland, Holland Edwards & Grossman, PC
1437 N. High Street
Denver, CO 80218

anna@hheglaw.com
(303) 860-1331
Party name: Professors Carol Anderson and Ian Farrell
Sherrilyn Ann Ifill
    Counsel of Record
Howard Law School
2929 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, D.C., DC 20008

sifill@sherrilyn-ifill.com
202-290-7933
Party name: Professor Sherrilyn Ifill
Erick G. Kaardal
    Counsel of Record
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson P.A.
150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3100
Minneapolis, MN 55402

KAARDAL@MKLAW.COM
612-465-0927
Party name: Ryan Binkley, Binkley for President 2024, Wisconsin Voter Alliance, Pure Integrity Michigan Elections, and Michigan Fair Elections
Michelle Shane Kallen
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MKallen@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice, Protect Democracy, Campaign Legal Center, League of Women Voters
Michael J. Kasper
    Counsel of Record
Kasper & Nottage, P.C.
151 North Franklin Street
Suite 2500
Chicago, IL 60606

mjkasper60@mac.com
(312) 704-3292
Party name: Professors Orville Vernon Burton, Allan J. Lichtman, Nell Irwin Painter, James M. McPherson, Manisha Sinha, et. al.
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

MKIMBERLY@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Edward B. Foley, Benjamin L. Ginsberg, and Richard L. Hasen
Susan J. Kohlmann
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1155 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

SKOHLMANN@JENNER.COM
212-891-1600
Party name: The Association of the Bar of the City of New York
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418808
Party name: Vivek Ramaswamy
Wallace K. Lightsey
    Counsel of Record
Wyche P.A.
200 East Broad Street, Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

wlightsey@wyche.com
864-242-8200
Party name: Brian J. Martin
Harold Emmett Lucas Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lucas & Nowak LLP
2664 Timber Drive, Suite 336
Garner, NC 27529

lukelucasis@gmail.com
(252) 432-0015
Party name: Pearl O. Madrial
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum LLP
222 West Washington Ave.
P.O. Box 1784
Madison, WI 53701

JMANDELL@STAFFORDLAW.COM
608.256.0226
Party name: Marc Racicot, William Weld, Christine Todd Whitman
Earl Neville Mayfield III
    Counsel of Record
Juris Day, PLLC
10521 Judicial Drive, Suite 200
Fairfax, VA 22030

tmayfield@jurisday.com
(703) 268-5600
Party name: The League for Sportsmen, Law Enforcement and Defense
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

tmccotter@boydengray.com
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, Majority Leader Steve Scalise, and 177 Other Members of Congress
Warner DeWitt Mendenhall
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Warner Mendenhall, Inc.
190 North Union Street
Suite 201
Akron, OH 44304

warner@warnermendenhall.com
330-535-9160
Party name: Terpsehore “Tore” Maras and Eligible Voters of All 50 States and 1 Territory
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
490 43rd Street
Oakland, CA 94609

JON@PUBLICRIGHTSPROJECT.ORG
510-738-6788
Party name: American Historians
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Professor Kurt T. Lash
Chad Dustin Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Chad D. Morgan
1950 W. Corporate Way #12279
Anaheim, CA 92801

chad@chadmorgan.com
(951) 667-1927
Party name: United States Justice Foundation & Policy Issues Institute, Inc.
Mari Newman
    Counsel of Record
Newman McNulty, LLC
1490 N. Lafayette Street
Suite 304
Denver, CO 80218

mari@newman-mcnulty.com
720-850-5770
Party name: Professors and Legal Scholars
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop and Kendrick LLP
41 South High Street
Suite 2400
Columbus, OH 43215

LOBHOF@SHUMAKER.COM
(614) 463-9441
Party name: Larry Kidd
Julia Ann Olson
    Counsel of Record
Our Children's Trust
1216 Lincoln Street
Eugene, OR 97401

julia@ourchildrenstrust.org
415 786 4825
Party name: Children's Rights Legal Scholars and Advocates
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc., Heller Foundation, Tennessee Firearms Association, Tennessee Firearms Foundation, Inc., Public Advocate of the United States, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, Constitution Party National Committee, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

MIKE@LANDMARKLEGAL.ORG
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Jesus Armando Osete
    Counsel of Record
BCLP LLP
221 Bolivar Street
Suite 101
Jefferson City, MO 65101-1574

jesus.osete@bclplaw.com
(573) 556-6620
Party name: The Secretaries of State of Missouri, Alabama, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Tennessee, and West Virginia
George T. Pallas
    Counsel of Record
George T. Pallas, P.A.
2420 Coral Way
Miami, FL 33145

george@pallaslaw.com
3058568580
Party name: Condemned USA
Edward Andrew Paltzik
    Counsel of Record
Bochner PLLC
1040 Avenue of the Americas
15th Floor
New York, NY 10018

epaltzik@gmail.com
5165260341
Party name: Gavin M. Wax, New York Young Republican Club Inc., and National Constitutional Law Union Inc.
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
1901 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1008
Washington, DC 20009

ROBERT.PECK@CCLFIRM.COM
2029442874
Party name: Professor Kermit Roosevelt
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Anthony John Powell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kansas Attomey General
120 SW 10th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

ANTHONY.POWELL@AG.KS.GOV
7853688539
Party name: Kansas
Burt M. Rublin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street, 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rublin@ballardspahr.com
(215) 864-8116
Party name: Michael T. Worley
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III, Michael B. Mukasey and William P. Barr; Law Professors Steven Calabresi and Gary Lawson; Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation
Paul D. Scott
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Paul D. Scott, P.C.
640 Washington Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

pdscott@lopds.com
4159811212
Party name: San Francisco Taxpayers Association, The Honorable Pete McCloskey & The Honorable Quentin L. Kopp
Chris Sevier2901 Old Franklin Rd., #1526
Antioch, TN 37013

ghostwarmusic@gmail.com
(615) 500-4411
Party name: Chris Sevier
Ann Maurine Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
G. Mennen Williams Building
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV
517-335-7628
Party name: Michigan Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson
Robert Trent Shores
    Counsel of Record
GableGotwals
110 North Elgin, Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74137

tshores@gablelaw.com
918-595-4800
Party name: Former United States Attorneys Robert S. Brewer, Jr., et al.
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger & Associates
4228 Hallmark Drive
Dallas, TX 75229

smogerlaw@gmail.com
9722435297
Party name: Professor Ilya Somin
Charles Robert Spies
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1825 Eye Street NW
STE 900
Washington, DC 20006

cspies@dickinsonwright.com
202-457-0160
Party name: The Honorable Peter Meijer
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

SSPITAL@NAACPLDF.ORG
212-965-2205
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
Robert A. Stein
    Counsel of Record
The Stein Law Firm, PLLC
1722 Hopkinton Road
Hopkinton, NH 03229

rstein@steinlawpllc.com
603-228-1109
Party name: David P. Cullenberg, Bryant "Corky" Messner, William C. Saturley
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Stone Hilton PLLC
1115 W. Slaughter Lane
Austin, TX 78748

judd@stonehilton.com
(737) 465-7248
Party name: Chuck Gray, Secretary of State of Wyoming
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

PATRICK@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
2075223163
Party name: Republican National Committee and National Republican Congressional Committee
David Bruce Tatge
    Counsel of Record
David B. Tatge, PLLC
13000 Grey Friars Place
Oak Hill, VA 20171

dtatge@tatgelawpllc.com
(703) 991-6087
Party name: David B. Tatge
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: U.S. Term Limits
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

JGTATTY@YAHOO.COM
502-412-9179
Party name: 102 Colorado Registered Electors
Craig Lee Uhrich
    Counsel of Record
McGowne & Uhrich P.A.
222 Center Avenue
Oakley, KS 67748

craig.uhrich@gmail.com
(720) 878-7688
Party name: Kansas Republican Party and 31 Other State and Territorial Republican Parties
John Vail
    Counsel of Record
John Vail Law PLLC
1025 Thomas Jefferson St., NW
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20007

john@johnvaillaw.com
2025891300
Party name: Experts in Democracy
Charles Devin Watkins
    Counsel of Record
1400 L St. NW Lbby 2 #34521
Washington, DC 20005-9997

devincwatkins@gmail.com
503-753-8104
Party name: Devin Watkins and Charles Watkins
David E. Weisberg
    Counsel of Record
David E. Weisberg, Esq.
105 Rattle Snap Ct
Cary, NC 27519-7424

dew47nj@yahoo.com
9193789843
Party name: David E. Weisberg
Stephen Yagman
    Counsel of Record
Yagman + Reichmann, LLP
333 Washington Boulevard
Venice Beach, CA 90292-5152

admin@yagmanlaw.net
310-452-3200
Party name: William Jones
John Choon Yoo
    Counsel of Record
1550 Tiburon Blvd. #G503
Tiburon, CA 94920

johncyoo@gmail.com
5103316708
Party name: The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Anthony R. Zelle
    Counsel of Record
Zelle & Larson LLP
380 Dedham St.
Newton, MA 02459

tzelle@earthlaw.org
(617) 388-4782
Party name: Jordan L. Michelson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543