Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-717
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-717
Title:Israel Alvarado, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lloyd J. Austin, III, Secretary of Defense, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2024
Linked with 23A264, 23A858
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1419)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2023Application (23A264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2023 to December 8, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Application (23A264) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 8, 2023.
Nov 28 2023Application (23A264) to extend further the time from December 8, 2023 to December 29, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Dec 01 2023Application (23A264) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 29, 2023.
Dec 29 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Waiver of right of respondent Lloyd Austin, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 26 2024Response Requested. (Due February 26, 2024)
Jan 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2024 to March 27, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Moral Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2024Application (23A858) for writ of injunction, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 27 2024Brief of respondents Lloyd J. Austin, III, Secretary of Defense, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 05 2024Reply of petitioners Israel Alvarado, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Chaplains' Counsel, PLLC,
21043 Honeycreeper Pl.
Leesburg, VA 20175

art@chaplainscounsel.com
703-645-4010
Party name: Israel Alvarado, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Lloyd Austin, et al.
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
655 Fifteenth St., NW, Ste. 425
Washington, DC 20005

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, Ministry to the Armed Forces of the Church of the Lutheran Brethren, Ausberg Luthern Churches, and Bible Churches Chaplaincy
Barry Paul Steinberg
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1625 Eye Street
Suite 800
Washington,, DC 20006

barry.steinberg@kutakrock.com
7036298737
Party name: Members of the United States Congress

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543