Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-6997
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-6997
Title:In Re Russell Rope, Petitioner
Docketed:March 15, 2024
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2023Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixPetitionProof of Service
Mar 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 15 2024Petition DENIED.
May 08 2024Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 27 2024DISTRIBUTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Russell Rope
    Counsel of Record
#1607 P.O. Box 1198
Sacramento, CA 95812

(310) 663-7655
Party name: Russell Rope

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543