Docket for 23-683
|
Dec 01 2023 | Application (23A509) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2023 to December 21, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 05 2023 | Application (23A509) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 21, 2023. | | | Dec 21 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 25, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 28 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2024 to February 26, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 29 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2024. | | | Feb 26 2024 | Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 11 2024 | Reply of petitioner Melynda Vincent filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 12 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024. | | |
|