SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-677
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-677
Title:
Royal Canin U.S.A., Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Anastasia Wullschleger, et al.
Docketed:
December 22, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1796)
Decision Date:
July 31, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
September 20, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 04 2024
Waiver of right of respondents Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 10 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 17 2024
Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2024)
Jan 24 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2024.
Feb 16 2024
Brief amicus curiae of The Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2024
Brief of respondents Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2024
Reply of petitioners Royal Canin U.S.A. Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 22 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 29 2024
Petition GRANTED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher M. Curran
Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005
ccurran@whitecase.com
202 626 3643
Party name: Royal Canin U.S.A. Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ashley Conrad Keller
Counsel of Record
Keller Postman LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606
ack@kellerpostman.com
(312) 741-5222
Party name: Anastasia Wullschleger, et al.
James Patrick Frickleton
Bartimus, Frickleton, Robertson, Rader, PC
4000 W. 114th St.
Suite 310
Leawood, KS 66211
jimf@bflawfirm.com
913-266-2300
Party name: Anastasia Wullschleger, et al.
Other
Claire Linda Leonard
Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LPP
700 13th Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20005
claire.leonard@freshfields.com
202-777-4764
Party name: The Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##