Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-6541
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-6541
Title:In Re Ronald Freeman, Petitioner
Docketed:January 23, 2024
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2024Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 25 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 20 2024Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ronald Freeman
    Counsel of Record
#24817-076
FCI Hazelton
PO Box 5000
Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Party name: Ronald Freeman

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543