Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-643
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-643
Title:We The Patriots USA, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Connecticut Office of Early Childhood Development, et al.
Docketed:December 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-249)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Waiver of right of respondent CT Office of Early Childhood Development and CT Dept. of Public Health to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2024Waiver of right of respondent Bethel Board of Education and Stamford Board of Education to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2024Waiver of right of respondent Glastonbury Board of Education to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of Physicians for Informed Consent filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 05 2024Response Requested. (Due March 6, 2024)
Feb 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2024 to April 20, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 22, 2024, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1.
Mar 06 2024Brief amicus curiae of Wagner Faith & Freedom Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2024 to May 22, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 20, 2024.
May 03 2024Letter updating counsel of record information for Petitioners of We The Patriots USA, Inc.: Constantina Lora; Miriam Hidalgo; Asma Elidrissi submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2024Brief of State respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2024Brief of respondents Bethel Board of Education and Stamford Board of Education in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2024Brief of respondent Glastonbury Board of Education in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
May 30 2024Reply of petitioners We The Patriots USA, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Cameron Lee Atkinson
    Counsel of Record
Atkinson Law, LLC
122 Litchfield Rd., P.O. Box 340
Harwinton, CT 06791

catkinson@atkinsonlawfirm.com
2036770782
Party name: We The Patriots USA, Inc.: Constantina Lora; Miriam Hidalgo; Asma Elidrissi
Brian David FestaWe The Patriots USA, Inc.
5210 Cleveland Blvd., Bldg. 140, Ste. 222
Caldwell, ID 83607

brian@wethepatriotsusa.org
(860) 863-6928
Party name: We The Patriots USA, Inc.,
Attorneys for Respondents
Darren Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Connecticut Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106

darren.cunningham@ct.gov
860-808-5210
Party name: CT Office of Early Childhood Development and CT Dept. of Public Health
Proloy Kumar Das
    Counsel of Record
FordHarrison LLP
CityPlace II
185 Asylum Street, Suite 820
Hartford, CT 06103

PDAS@FORDHARRISON.COM
860-740-1077
Party name: Bethel Board of Education and Stamford Board of Education
Thomas R. Gerarde
    Counsel of Record
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
100 Great Meadow Road, Suite 201
Wethersfield, CT 06109

tgerarde@hl-law.com
860-249-1361
Party name: Glastonbury Board of Education
Other
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
925-642-6651
Party name: Physicians for Informed Consent
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 West Mount Hope Hwy
Suite 2
Lansing, MI 48917

PROF.WWJD@GMAIL.COM
517-643-1765
Party name: Wagner Faith & Freedom Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543