Docket for 23-6304
|
Dec 12 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 19 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2024 to February 19, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 23 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2024. See Rule 30.1. | | | Feb 13 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2024 to March 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 14 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 21, 2024. | | | Mar 21 2024 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 03 2024 | Reply of petitioner Onterrious V. Tillman filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. | | | May 06 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | |
|