Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-626
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-626
Title:Elon Musk, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:December 11, 2023
Linked with 23A342
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1291)
   Decision Date:May 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:July 24, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2023Application (23A342) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2023 to December 7, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 18 2023Application (23A342) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 7, 2023.
Dec 07 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Waiver of right of respondent U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 21 2023Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2024)
Jan 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2024 to February 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2024.
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2024 to March 22, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ellyde Roko Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7344
Party name: Elon Musk
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

PEGGY.LITTLE@NCLA.ONMICROSOFT.COM
2028695212
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543