Docket for 23-621
|
Oct 27 2023 | Application (23A390) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 5, 2023 to November 20, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 01 2023 | Application (23A390) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 20, 2023. | | | Nov 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 05 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. | | | Jan 29 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024) | | | Feb 28 2024 | Brief of respondents Damian Stinnie, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 19 2024 | Reply of petitioner Gerald F. Lackey, in his Official Capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 22 2024 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Apr 24 2024 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. | | Main Document | Apr 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 20, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2024. | | |
|