Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-62
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-62
Title:Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Scott A. Hardin
Docketed:July 21, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6380)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2023.
Sep 20 2023Brief of respondent Scott A. Hardin in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 05 2023Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Todd Hardin
    Counsel of Record
Hardin Law PLLC
P.O. Box 9537
Louisville, KY 40209

hardinlaw@twc.com
5024452673
Party name: Scott A. Hardin

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543