Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-6170
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-6170
Title:Edell Jackson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2870)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2024 to February 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2024.
Feb 05 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Gerdts
    Counsel of Record
Daniel L. Gerdts, Lawyer
331 Second Avenue South
Suite 705
Minneapolis, MN 55401

daniel@danielgerdtslaw.com
6128005086
Party name: Edell Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543