Docket for 23-6143
|
Nov 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2024 to February 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2024. | | | Jan 25 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 4, 2024. | | | Mar 04 2024 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 13 2024 | Reply of petitioner Howard Nelson Bartee filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 21 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. | | |
|