Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-612
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-612
Title:Joseph Daniel Cascino, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jane Nelson, Texas Secretary of State
Docketed:December 7, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-50748)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Waiver of right of respondent Jane Nelson to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Jan 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2024Response Requested. (Due February 15, 2024)
Jan 19 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2024.
Mar 18 2024Brief of respondent Jane Nelson, Texas Secretary of State in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 03 2024Reply of petitioners Joseph Daniel Cascino, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Brazil & Dunn, LLP
1900 Pearl Street
Austin, TX 78705

chad@brazilanddunn.com
512-717-9822
Party name: Joseph Daniel Cascino, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Jane Nelson
Aaron Lloyd NielsonOffice of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Jane Nelson
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543