Docket for 23-6049
|
Nov 15 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 18, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2023 to January 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2024. | | | Jan 10 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2024. | | | Feb 16 2024 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 07 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024. | | | Mar 19 2024 | Rescheduled. | | | Mar 25 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024. | | | Mar 26 2024 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 08 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. | | |
|