Docket for 23-60
 | |
|
Jun 09 2023 | Application (22A1066) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 21, 2023 to July 21, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 09 2023 | Application (22A1066) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 21, 2023. | | | Jul 21 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2023) | | PetitionProof of Service | Jul 25 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2023. | | | Aug 23 2023 | Brief of respondents Feds for Medical Freedom, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Sep 06 2023 | Reply of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 18 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Sep 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. | | | Oct 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. | | | Oct 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. | | | Oct 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023. | | | Nov 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. | | | Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. | | | Nov 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023. | | | Dec 01 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Dec 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. | | |
|