Sep 08 2023 | Application (23A236) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 26, 2023 to October 26, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Sep 14 2023 | Application (23A236) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 26, 2023. |
| |
Oct 11 2023 | Application (23A236) to extend further the time from October 26, 2023 to November 25, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Written RequestProof of Service |
Oct 16 2023 | Application (23A236) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 27, 2023. |
| |
Nov 22 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2023) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 18 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2023 to January 27, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 19 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2024. See Rule 30.1. |
| |
Jan 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2024 to February 28, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 28, 2024. |
| |
Feb 22 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2024 to March 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 23 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 6, 2024. |
| |
Mar 06 2024 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
| |
Mar 20 2024 | Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 03 2024 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
| |
Apr 16 2024 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. |
| |
Apr 22 2024 | Rescheduled. |
| |