Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-5606
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-5606
Title:Samuel Valencia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-50283)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:June 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 18, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2023 to November 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 17, 2023.
Oct 17 2023Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 23 2023Letter from counsel for petitioner and waiver of the right to file a reply under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Judy Fulmer Madewell
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
300 Convent Street
Suite 2300
San Antonio, TX 78205

JUDY_MADEWELL@FD.ORG
(210) 472-6700
Party name: Samuel Valencia
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543