Docket for 23-5457
|
Aug 22 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 27, 2023 to October 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 27, 2023. | | | Oct 17 2023 | Brief of respondent United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 20 2023 | Reply of petitioner Deangelus Thomas filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 24 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Oct 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. | | | Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. | | |
|